Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1095 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2021