Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1109 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 1109


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring public schools to provide instruction and
 materials and adopt policies relating to the prevention of child
 abuse, family violence, and dating violence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Christine Blubaugh
 Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (u) to read as follows:
 (u)  The State Board of Education shall adopt rules requiring
 students to receive instruction on the prevention of child abuse,
 family violence, and dating violence at least once in middle or
 junior high school and at least twice in high school. The
 instruction must include information on:
 (1)  the dating violence policy adopted by the
 student's school district under Section 37.0831;
 (2)  the prevalence of dating violence and the
 recognition of abuse warning signs;
 (3)  the procedures for reporting violence or abuse;
 and
 (4)  educational materials or resources available to
 students under Section 37.0831(c).
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 37.0831, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0831.  DATING VIOLENCE POLICIES; EDUCATIONAL
 MATERIALS AND RESOURCES.
 SECTION 4.  Section 37.0831, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  A dating violence policy must:
 (1)  include:
 (A)  a definition of dating violence that includes
 the intentional use of physical, sexual, verbal, or emotional abuse
 by a person to harm, threaten, intimidate, or control another
 person in a dating relationship, as defined by Section 71.0021,
 Family Code;
 (B)  a clear statement that dating violence is not
 tolerated at school;
 (C)  reporting procedures and guidelines for
 students who are victims of dating violence; and
 (D)  information regarding the instruction on the
 prevention of dating violence required under Section 28.002(u); and
 (2)  address safety planning, enforcement of
 protective orders, school-based alternatives to protective orders,
 training for teachers and administrators, counseling for affected
 students, and awareness education for students and parents.
 (c)  To the extent possible, a school district shall make
 available to students:
 (1)  age-appropriate educational materials that
 include information on the dangers of dating violence; and
 (2)  resources to students seeking help.
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
 school year.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1109 passed the Senate on
 May 4, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 2; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1109 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 99,
 Nays 48, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor