Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1116 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2021

                    S.B. No. 1116


 AN ACT
 relating to a county, city, or independent school district posting
 election notices and results on an Internet website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 65, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 65.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 65.016.  INTERNET POSTING OF ELECTION RESULTS. (a) A
 county that holds or provides election services for an election and
 maintains an Internet website shall post on its public Internet
 website for an election of public officials or of a governmental
 entity authorized by law to impose a tax administered by the county:
 (1)  the results of each election;
 (2)  the total number of votes cast;
 (3)  the total number of votes cast for each candidate
 or for or against each measure;
 (4)  the total number of votes cast by personal
 appearance on election day;
 (5)  the total number of votes cast by personal
 appearance or mail during the early voting period; and
 (6)  the total number of counted and uncounted
 provisional ballots cast.
 (b)  A city or independent school district that holds an
 election and maintains an Internet website shall post on its public
 Internet website for the city or independent school district, as
 applicable:
 (1)  the results of each election;
 (2)  the total number of votes cast;
 (3)  the total number of votes cast for each candidate
 or for or against each measure;
 (4)  the total number of votes cast by personal
 appearance on election day;
 (5)  the total number of votes cast by personal
 appearance or mail during the early voting period; and
 (6)  the total number of counted and uncounted
 provisional ballots cast.
 (c)  The information described by Subsections (a) and (b)
 must be:
 (1)  posted as soon as practicable after the election;
 and
 (2)  accessible without having to make more than two
 selections or view more than two network locations after accessing
 the Internet website home page of the county, city, or district, as
 applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 4, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Section 4.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 4.009.  INTERNET POSTING. (a) Not later than the 21st
 day before election day, a county that holds or provides election
 services for an election and maintains an Internet website shall
 post on its public Internet website for an election of public
 officials or of a governmental entity authorized by law to impose a
 tax administered by the county:
 (1)  the date of the election;
 (2)  the location of each polling place;
 (3)  each candidate for an elected office on the
 ballot; and
 (4)  each measure on the ballot.
 (b)  Not later than the 21st day before election day, a city
 or independent school district that holds an election and maintains
 an Internet website shall post on the public Internet website for
 the city or independent school district, as applicable:
 (1)  the date of the next election;
 (2)  the location of each polling place;
 (3)  each candidate for an elected office on the
 ballot; and
 (4)  each measure on the ballot.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1116 passed the Senate on
 April 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1116 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor