Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021