05/28/2021 | Effective immediately | |||
05/28/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/19/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/19/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Record vote RV#1195 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2894 | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |