S.B. No. 1123 AN ACT relating to the issuance of Family First specialty license plates. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 504.675 to read as follows: Sec. 504.675. FAMILY FIRST LICENSE PLATES. (a) The department shall issue specialty license plates that include the words "Family First." The department shall design the plates in consultation with a representative of the Family First nonprofit organization. (b) After deduction of the department's administrative costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates shall be deposited to the credit of an account created by the comptroller in the manner provided by Section 504.6012(b). Money deposited to that account may be used only by the Texas Education Agency to make grants to a nonprofit organization with chapters operating in schools in this state whose primary purpose is promoting the importance of fatherhood. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1123 passed the Senate on April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 28, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1123 passed the House, with amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 2, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor