Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1123 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 1123


 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of Family First specialty license plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.675 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.675.  FAMILY FIRST LICENSE PLATES. (a) The
 department shall issue specialty license plates that include the
 words "Family First." The department shall design the plates in
 consultation with a representative of the Family First nonprofit
 organization.
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
 shall be deposited to the credit of an account created by the
 comptroller in the manner provided by Section 504.6012(b). Money
 deposited to that account may be used only by the Texas Education
 Agency to make grants to a nonprofit organization with chapters
 operating in schools in this state whose primary purpose is
 promoting the importance of fatherhood.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1123 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 28, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1123 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 2, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor