6 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code, |
---|
8 | 13 | | is amended by adding Section 504.675 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 14 | | Sec. 504.675. FAMILY FIRST LICENSE PLATES. (a) The |
---|
10 | 15 | | department shall issue specialty license plates that include the |
---|
11 | 16 | | words "Family First." The department shall design the plates in |
---|
12 | 17 | | consultation with a representative of the Family First nonprofit |
---|
13 | 18 | | organization. |
---|
14 | 19 | | (b) After deduction of the department's administrative |
---|
15 | 20 | | costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates |
---|
16 | 21 | | shall be deposited to the credit of an account created by the |
---|
17 | 22 | | comptroller in the manner provided by Section 504.6012(b). Money |
---|
18 | 23 | | deposited to that account may be used only by the Texas Education |
---|
19 | 24 | | Agency to make grants to a nonprofit organization with chapters |
---|
20 | 25 | | operating in schools in this state whose primary purpose is |
---|
21 | 26 | | promoting the importance of fatherhood. |
---|
22 | | - | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
23 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
24 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
25 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1123 passed the Senate on |
---|
26 | | - | April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
27 | | - | May 28, 2021, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
28 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2021, House |
---|
29 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 30, 2021, Senate adopted |
---|
30 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
31 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
34 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1123 passed the House, with |
---|
35 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, |
---|
36 | | - | Nays 2, two present not voting; May 28, 2021, House granted request |
---|
37 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
38 | | - | May 30, 2021, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
39 | | - | following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 2, two present not voting. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
42 | | - | Approved: |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Date |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 27 | + | SECTION 2. Section 504.851(i), Transportation Code, is |
---|
| 28 | + | amended to read as follows: |
---|
| 29 | + | (i) A contract entered into by the department with a private |
---|
| 30 | + | vendor under this section: |
---|
| 31 | + | (1) must comply with any law generally applicable to a |
---|
| 32 | + | contract for services entered into by the department; |
---|
| 33 | + | (2) must require the private vendor to render at least |
---|
| 34 | + | quarterly to the department periodic accounts that accurately |
---|
| 35 | + | detail all material transactions, including information reasonably |
---|
| 36 | + | required by the department to support fees that are collected by the |
---|
| 37 | + | vendor, and to regularly remit all money payable to the department |
---|
| 38 | + | under the contract; [and] |
---|
| 39 | + | (3) may allow or require the private vendor to |
---|
| 40 | + | establish an electronic infrastructure coordinated and compatible |
---|
| 41 | + | with the department's registration system, by which motor vehicle |
---|
| 42 | + | owners may electronically send and receive applications, other |
---|
| 43 | + | documents, or required payments, and that, when secure access is |
---|
| 44 | + | necessary, can be electronically validated by the department; and |
---|
| 45 | + | (4) must allow the private vendor to establish a range |
---|
| 46 | + | of premium embossed specialty license plates to be sourced, |
---|
| 47 | + | marketed, and sold by the private vendor. |
---|
| 48 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|