Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1130 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/18/2021

                            S.B. No. 1130


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of certain massage therapy instruction
 using distance learning.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.156, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  An applicant for a license under this section must be an
 individual and:
 (1)  present evidence satisfactory to the department
 that the person has satisfactorily completed massage therapy
 studies in a 500-hour minimum, supervised course of instruction in
 a manner provided by Subsection (c) [provided by a massage therapy
 instructor at a massage school, a licensed massage school, a
 state-approved educational institution, or any combination of
 instructors or schools], in which at least:
 (A)  200 hours are taught by a licensed massage
 therapy instructor and dedicated to the study of massage therapy
 techniques and theory and the practice of manipulation of soft
 tissue, with at least 125 hours dedicated to the study of Swedish
 massage therapy techniques;
 (B)  50 hours are dedicated to the study of
 anatomy;
 (C)  25 hours are dedicated to the study of
 physiology;
 (D)  50 hours are dedicated to the study of
 kinesiology;
 (E)  40 hours are dedicated to the study of
 pathology;
 (F)  20 hours are dedicated to the study of
 hydrotherapy;
 (G)  45 hours are dedicated to the study of
 massage therapy laws and rules, business practices, and
 professional ethics standards;
 (H)  20 hours are dedicated to the study of
 health, hygiene, first aid, universal precautions, and
 cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR); and
 (I)  50 hours are spent in an internship program;
 (2)  pass the required examinations; and
 (3)  be at least 18 years of age.
 (c)  The hours of instruction required by Subsection (b) must
 be provided by a massage therapy instructor at a massage school,
 licensed massage school, state-approved educational institution,
 or any combination of instructors or schools. The hours of
 instruction required by Subsections (b)(1)(B)-(H) may be provided
 using distance learning.  Distance learning is not limited to live
 instruction.
 SECTION 2.  An applicant for a massage therapist license may
 satisfy the requirements of Sections 455.156(b)(1)(B)-(H),
 Occupations Code, using distance learning as provided by Section
 455.156(c), Occupations Code, as added by this Act, regardless of
 whether the application is submitted before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1130 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1130 passed the House on
 May 11, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 9, two present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor