Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1165 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            S.B. No. 1165


 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment and terms of the board of the hospital
 managers of the Dallas County Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 281.0211(c) and (d), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  On or after September 1, 2030 [2022], the Dallas County
 Commissioners Court shall appoint members to the board in
 accordance with Sections 281.021(a) and 281.022(a).
 (d)  Subsection (c) does not affect the entitlement of a
 member of the board of the Dallas County Hospital District
 appointed to the board under this section before September 1, 2030
 [2022], to continue to carry out the member's functions for the
 remainder of the member's term.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1165 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1165 passed the House on
 May 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 115, Nays 30, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor