4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to the establishment of a task force to evaluate |
---|
6 | 8 | | state-owned artifact collections. |
---|
7 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 10 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "task force" means the |
---|
9 | 11 | | task force established under Section 2 of this Act. |
---|
10 | 12 | | SECTION 2. ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE. A task force is |
---|
11 | 13 | | established to manage artifact collections owned by this state. |
---|
12 | 14 | | SECTION 3. TASK FORCE MEMBERSHIP. (a) The task force is |
---|
13 | 15 | | composed of representatives of the: |
---|
14 | 16 | | (1) Texas Historical Commission; |
---|
15 | 17 | | (2) General Land Office; |
---|
16 | 18 | | (3) Texas State Library and Archives Commission; |
---|
17 | 19 | | (4) Parks and Wildlife Department; |
---|
18 | 20 | | (5) State Preservation Board; and |
---|
19 | 21 | | (6) Texas Facilities Commission. |
---|
20 | 22 | | (b) The executive director of each state agency represented |
---|
21 | 23 | | on the task force shall appoint an employee of the agency to serve |
---|
22 | 24 | | as the agency's representative on the task force not later than |
---|
23 | 25 | | October 1, 2021. |
---|
24 | 26 | | (c) The member representing the Texas Facilities Commission |
---|
25 | 27 | | must have engineering and architectural expertise. |
---|
26 | 28 | | SECTION 4. REIMBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES. A member of the task |
---|
27 | 29 | | force is not entitled to compensation for service on the task force |
---|
28 | 30 | | but is entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses incurred by |
---|
29 | 31 | | the member while conducting the business of the task force as |
---|
30 | 32 | | provided by the General Appropriations Act. |
---|
31 | 33 | | SECTION 5. DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. For each state agency |
---|
32 | 34 | | represented on the task force, the task force shall: |
---|
33 | 35 | | (1) evaluate the need for a separate collections |
---|
34 | 36 | | facility for the agency and compare use of a separate collection |
---|
35 | 37 | | facility to a secure centrally located joint collections facility |
---|
36 | 38 | | with a processing laboratory for repair, cleaning, re-housing, and |
---|
37 | 39 | | light conservation of state artifacts, including cost estimates for |
---|
38 | 40 | | maintaining a separate collections facility for each agency |
---|
39 | 41 | | compared to a joint collections facility; |
---|
40 | 42 | | (2) analyze the storage capacity for the agency's |
---|
41 | 43 | | collections to determine whether the agency's collections facility |
---|
42 | 44 | | is adequate for the agency's successful stewardship of its |
---|
43 | 45 | | collections over the next five years and 10 years; |
---|
44 | 46 | | (3) review the option of establishing a |
---|
45 | 47 | | disaster-secure collections facility with separate storage areas |
---|
46 | 48 | | for each agency; |
---|
47 | 49 | | (4) review the recommendations in the Texas Historical |
---|
48 | 50 | | Commission's December 2018 response to the Sunset Advisory |
---|
49 | 51 | | Commission decisions on creating a searchable public catalog of |
---|
50 | 52 | | state-owned collections to determine cost estimates for |
---|
51 | 53 | | implementing the recommendations and a process for implementing the |
---|
52 | 54 | | recommendations; and |
---|
53 | 55 | | (5) assess any unmet need of the agency regarding |
---|
54 | 56 | | state-owned collections as determined by the task force. |
---|
55 | 57 | | SECTION 6. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the |
---|
56 | 58 | | task force shall report the task force's findings and |
---|
57 | 59 | | determinations under Section 5 of this Act to the governor, |
---|
58 | 60 | | lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and |
---|
59 | 61 | | standing committees of each house of the legislature with primary |
---|
60 | 62 | | jurisdiction over the history and culture of this state. |
---|
61 | 63 | | SECTION 7. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this |
---|
62 | 64 | | Act expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
63 | 65 | | SECTION 8. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September |
---|
64 | 66 | | 1, 2021. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
67 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1177 passed the Senate on |
---|
68 | | - | April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
71 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1177 passed the House on |
---|
72 | | - | May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 118, Nays 27, two |
---|
73 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
74 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
76 | | - | Approved: |
---|
77 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | | - | Date |
---|
79 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
80 | | - | Governor |
---|