Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1177 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            S.B. No. 1177


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force to evaluate
 state-owned artifact collections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "task force" means the
 task force established under Section 2 of this Act.
 SECTION 2.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE. A task force is
 established to manage artifact collections owned by this state.
 SECTION 3.  TASK FORCE MEMBERSHIP. (a) The task force is
 composed of representatives of the:
 (1)  Texas Historical Commission;
 (2)  General Land Office;
 (3)  Texas State Library and Archives Commission;
 (4)  Parks and Wildlife Department;
 (5)  State Preservation Board; and
 (6)  Texas Facilities Commission.
 (b)  The executive director of each state agency represented
 on the task force shall appoint an employee of the agency to serve
 as the agency's representative on the task force not later than
 October 1, 2021.
 (c)  The member representing the Texas Facilities Commission
 must have engineering and architectural expertise.
 SECTION 4.  REIMBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES. A member of the task
 force is not entitled to compensation for service on the task force
 but is entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses incurred by
 the member while conducting the business of the task force as
 provided by the General Appropriations Act.
 SECTION 5.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. For each state agency
 represented on the task force, the task force shall:
 (1)  evaluate the need for a separate collections
 facility for the agency and compare use of a separate collection
 facility to a secure centrally located joint collections facility
 with a processing laboratory for repair, cleaning, re-housing, and
 light conservation of state artifacts, including cost estimates for
 maintaining a separate collections facility for each agency
 compared to a joint collections facility;
 (2)  analyze the storage capacity for the agency's
 collections to determine whether the agency's collections facility
 is adequate for the agency's successful stewardship of its
 collections over the next five years and 10 years;
 (3)  review the option of establishing a
 disaster-secure collections facility with separate storage areas
 for each agency;
 (4)  review the recommendations in the Texas Historical
 Commission's December 2018 response to the Sunset Advisory
 Commission decisions on creating a searchable public catalog of
 state-owned collections to determine cost estimates for
 implementing the recommendations and a process for implementing the
 recommendations; and
 (5)  assess any unmet need of the agency regarding
 state-owned collections as determined by the task force.
 SECTION 6.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2022, the
 task force shall report the task force's findings and
 determinations under Section 5 of this Act to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 standing committees of each house of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over the history and culture of this state.
 SECTION 7.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this
 Act expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 8.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September
 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1177 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1177 passed the House on
 May 23, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 118, Nays 27, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor