Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021