Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1202 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2021

                    S.B. No. 1202


 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of certain utility provisions to a
 vehicle charging service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 31.002(6) and (17), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (6)  "Electric utility" means a person or river
 authority that owns or operates for compensation in this state
 equipment or facilities to produce, generate, transmit,
 distribute, sell, or furnish electricity in this state.  The term
 includes a lessee, trustee, or receiver of an electric utility and a
 recreational vehicle park owner who does not comply with Subchapter
 C, Chapter 184, with regard to the metered sale of electricity at
 the recreational vehicle park.  The term does not include:
 (A)  a municipal corporation;
 (B)  a qualifying facility;
 (C)  a power generation company;
 (D)  an exempt wholesale generator;
 (E)  a power marketer;
 (F)  a corporation described by Section 32.053 to
 the extent the corporation sells electricity exclusively at
 wholesale and not to the ultimate consumer;
 (G)  an electric cooperative;
 (H)  a retail electric provider;
 (I)  this state or an agency of this state; or
 (J)  a person not otherwise an electric utility
 who:
 (i)  furnishes an electric service or
 commodity only to itself, its employees, or its tenants as an
 incident of employment or tenancy, if that service or commodity is
 not resold to or used by others;
 (ii)  owns or operates in this state
 equipment or facilities to produce, generate, transmit,
 distribute, sell, or furnish electric energy to an electric
 utility, if the equipment or facilities are used primarily to
 produce and generate electric energy for consumption by that
 person; [or]
 (iii)  owns or operates in this state a
 recreational vehicle park that provides metered electric service in
 accordance with Subchapter C, Chapter 184; or
 (iv)  owns or operates equipment used solely
 to provide electricity charging service for consumption by an
 alternatively fueled vehicle, as defined by Section 502.004,
 Transportation Code.
 (17)  "Retail electric provider" means a person that
 sells electric energy to retail customers in this state.  A retail
 electric provider may not own or operate generation assets.  The
 term does not include a person not otherwise a retail electric
 provider who owns or operates equipment used solely to provide
 electricity charging service for consumption by an alternatively
 fueled vehicle, as defined by Section 502.004, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 31, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.0021.  CHARGING SERVICE.  The commission by rule may
 exempt from the definition of "electric utility" or "retail
 electric provider" under Section 31.002 a provider who owns or
 operates equipment used solely to provide electricity charging
 service for a mode of transportation.
 SECTION 3.  Section 37.001(3), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (3)  "Retail electric utility" means a person,
 political subdivision, electric cooperative, or agency that
 operates, maintains, or controls in this state a facility to
 provide retail electric utility service.  The term does not include
 a corporation described by Section 32.053 to the extent that the
 corporation sells electricity exclusively at wholesale and not to
 the ultimate consumer.  A qualifying cogenerator that sells
 electric energy at retail to the sole purchaser of the
 cogenerator's thermal output under Sections 35.061 and 36.007 is
 not for that reason considered to be a retail electric utility.  The
 owner or operator of a qualifying cogeneration facility who was
 issued the necessary environmental permits from the Texas Natural
 Resource Conservation Commission after January 1, 1998, and who
 commenced construction of such qualifying facility before July 1,
 1998, may provide electricity to the purchasers of the thermal
 output of that qualifying facility and shall not for that reason be
 considered an electric utility or a retail electric utility,
 provided that the purchasers of the thermal output are owners of
 manufacturing or process operation facilities that are located on a
 site entirely owned before September, 1987, by one owner who
 retained ownership after September, 1987, of some portion of the
 facilities and that those facilities now share some integrated
 operations, such as the provision of services and raw materials.  A
 person who owns or operates equipment used solely to provide
 electricity charging service for consumption by an alternatively
 fueled vehicle, as defined by Section 502.004, Transportation Code,
 is not for that reason considered to be a retail electric utility.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 37, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.002.  CHARGING SERVICE.  The commission may by rule
 exempt from the definition of "retail electric utility" under
 Section 37.001 a provider who owns or operates equipment used
 solely to provide electricity charging service for a mode of
 transportation.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1202 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1202 passed the House on
 May 20, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 1, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor