Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2021