Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021