Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1230 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1230
1+By: Taylor, et al. S.B. No. 1230
2+ (Pacheco)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to establishing the Texas Commission on Community College
68 Finance.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
911 amended by adding Section 130.1305 to read as follows:
1012 Sec. 130.1305. TEXAS COMMISSION ON COMMUNITY COLLEGE
1113 FINANCE. (a) The Texas Commission on Community College Finance is
1214 established to make recommendations for consideration by the 88th
1315 Texas Legislature regarding the state funding formula and funding
1416 levels for public junior colleges in Texas that would be sufficient
1517 to sustain viable junior college education and training offerings
1618 throughout the state and improve student outcomes in alignment with
1719 state postsecondary goals.
1820 (b) The commission is composed of 12 members as follows:
1921 (1) four members appointed by the governor;
2022 (2) three members appointed by the lieutenant
2123 governor;
2224 (3) three members appointed by the speaker of the
2325 house of representatives;
2426 (4) one member appointed by the board of the Texas
2527 Association of Community Colleges; and
2628 (5) one member appointed by the board of the Community
2729 College Association of Texas Trustees.
2830 (c) One of the members appointed by the governor must be a
2931 faculty member at a public junior college as defined by Section
3032 61.003, and the other members appointed by the governor must be
3133 representatives of junior college leaders, business leaders, or
3234 other stakeholders knowledgeable in junior college mission,
3335 instructional programs, and finance.
3436 (d) Members appointed by the lieutenant governor shall
3537 consist of:
3638 (1) two members of the senate; and
37- (2) one individual who is an administrator of a public
38- junior college as defined by Section 61.003, a business leader, or a
39- stakeholder knowledgeable in junior college mission, instructional
40- programs, and finance.
39+ (2) an administrator from a public junior college as
40+ defined by Section 61.003.
4141 (e) Members appointed by the speaker of the house of
4242 representatives shall consist of:
4343 (1) two members of the house of representatives; and
4444 (2) an administrator from a public junior college as
4545 defined by Section 61.003.
4646 (f) In making appointments, the governor, lieutenant
4747 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives shall
4848 coordinate to ensure that the membership of the commission
4949 reflects, to the extent possible, the geographic diversity of Texas
5050 public junior colleges and the ethnic diversity of the communities
5151 served by those junior colleges.
5252 (g) The commission shall convene not later than October 15,
5353 2021, and shall continue its activities until completion of a final
5454 report.
5555 (h) The commission shall examine trend and forecast data,
5656 seek stakeholder input, and account for equity in student outcomes
5757 and based on its findings, make recommendations on:
5858 (1) the components of state funding for public junior
5959 colleges, including contact hour funding formulas established for
6060 public junior colleges under Subchapter C, Chapter 61, and
6161 Subchapter A of this chapter; and
6262 (2) the feasibility of establishing shared service
6363 agreements or interinstitutional collaborations through which
6464 institutions of higher education may perform administrative
6565 services, other than direct instruction and student support
6666 services, for other institutions of higher education for a fee or
6767 other consideration.
68- (i) To inform the recommendations required under Subsection
69- (h), the commission may examine and make recommendations on other
70- policy and finance matters, including:
71- (1) workforce demand and skills gaps;
72- (2) dual credit programs and costs;
73- (3) variation between taxing districts and service
74- areas;
75- (4) student graduation, transfer, and success
76- metrics; and
77- (5) the relationship between economic cycles and
78- student enrollment.
79- (j) The commission may seek resource support, including
68+ (i) The commission may seek resource support, including
8069 data analyses and technical assistance, from the Texas Higher
8170 Education Coordinating Board, the Texas Association of Community
8271 Colleges, and research organizations. The commission may accept
8372 gifts, grants, and donations from any source to be used to carry out
8473 a function of the commission.
85- (k) The governor shall designate the presiding officer of
86- the commission.
87- (l) The commission shall submit a final report and
74+ (j) The commission shall submit a final report and
8875 recommendations to the governor, lieutenant governor, and both
8976 houses of the legislature not later than November 1, 2022.
90- (m) This section expires January 1, 2023.
77+ (k) This section expires January 1, 2023.
9178 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
92- ______________________________ ______________________________
93- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
94- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1230 passed the Senate on
95- April 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
96- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2021, by the
97- following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
98- ______________________________
99- Secretary of the Senate
100- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1230 passed the House, with
101- amendment, on May 7, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 119,
102- Nays 15, one present not voting.
103- ______________________________
104- Chief Clerk of the House
105- Approved:
106- ______________________________
107- Date
108- ______________________________
109- Governor