House | 04/15/2021 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/16/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |