Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 19, 2021