Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1234 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/12/2021

                    By: Hughes, Creighton S.B. No. 1234


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a voting system use a paper record or
 produce a paper receipt for verification purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 129, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 129.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 129.003.  PAPER AUDIT TRAIL REQUIRED. (a) In this
 section, "auditable voting system" means a voting system that:
 (1)  uses a paper record; or
 (2)  produces a paper record by which a voter can verify
 that the voter's ballot will be counted accurately.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (e), a voting system
 that consists of direct recording electronic voting machines may
 not be used in an election unless the system is an auditable voting
 system.
 (c)  Except for a recount under Title 13 or an election
 contest under Title 14, the electronic vote is the official record
 of the ballot. For a recount of ballots cast on a system involving
 direct recording electronic voting machines, or in an election
 contest, the paper record is the official record of the vote cast.
 (d)  An authority that purchased a voting system other than
 an auditable voting system after September 1, 2016, and before
 September 1, 2021, may use available federal funding and, if
 federal funding is not available, available state funding to
 retrofit the purchased voting system as an auditable voting system
 in accordance with the following schedule:
 (1)  if the voting system was retrofitted as an
 auditable voting system not later than the election taking place
 November 8, 2022, the authority is eligible to have 100 percent of
 the cost of retrofitting reimbursed under this section; and
 (2)  if the authority is not eligible for a 100 percent
 reimbursement of cost under Subdivision (1) and the voting system
 was retrofitted as an auditable voting system not later than the
 election taking place November 3, 2026, the authority is eligible
 to have 50 percent of the cost of retrofitting reimbursed under this
 section.
 (e)  Subsections (a)-(c) do not apply to an election held
 before September 1, 2026.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.