1 | 1 | | 87R729 JRR-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Johnson S.B. No. 125 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the regulation of hydrofluorocarbons under the Texas |
---|
8 | 8 | | Clean Air Act. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 382, Health and Safety Code, is amended |
---|
11 | 11 | | by adding Subchapter L to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SUBCHAPTER L. REGULATION OF HYDROFLUOROCARBONS |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 382.551. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) "Class I substances" and "class II substances" |
---|
15 | 15 | | mean those substances listed in 42 U.S.C. Section 7671a, as that |
---|
16 | 16 | | section existed on November 15, 1990, or those substances listed in |
---|
17 | 17 | | Appendix A or B of 40 C.F.R. Part 82, Subpart A, as those appendices |
---|
18 | 18 | | existed on January 3, 2017. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Hydrofluorocarbons" means the class of |
---|
20 | 20 | | greenhouse gases that are saturated organic compounds containing |
---|
21 | 21 | | hydrogen, fluorine, and carbon. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (3) "Residential consumer refrigeration products" |
---|
23 | 23 | | means a consumer refrigeration product as defined by 10 C.F.R. |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 430.2 that is designed or manufactured primarily for |
---|
25 | 25 | | residential use. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (4) "Retrofit" has the meaning assigned by 40 C.F.R. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Section 82.152, as that section existed as of January 3, 2017. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (5) "Substitute" means a chemical, product, or |
---|
29 | 29 | | alternative manufacturing process, whether existing or retrofit, |
---|
30 | 30 | | that is used to perform a function previously performed by a class I |
---|
31 | 31 | | substance or class II substance and any substitute subsequently |
---|
32 | 32 | | adopted to perform that function, including hydrofluorocarbons. |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 382.552. REGULATION OF HYDROFLUOROCARBONS. (a) |
---|
34 | 34 | | Except as otherwise provided by this section, a person may not offer |
---|
35 | 35 | | any product or equipment for sale, lease, or rent, or install or |
---|
36 | 36 | | otherwise cause any product or equipment to enter into commerce in |
---|
37 | 37 | | this state if that product or equipment consists of, uses, or will |
---|
38 | 38 | | use a substitute, as provided in Appendix U or V of 40 C.F.R. Part |
---|
39 | 39 | | 82, Subpart G, as those appendices existed on January 3, 2017, for |
---|
40 | 40 | | the applications or end uses restricted by those appendices. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) Except where existing equipment is retrofit, Subsection |
---|
42 | 42 | | (a) does not require a person that acquired a prohibited product or |
---|
43 | 43 | | equipment before the applicable effective date specified in |
---|
44 | 44 | | Subsection (c) for the prohibition to cease use of that product or |
---|
45 | 45 | | equipment. Products or equipment manufactured before the |
---|
46 | 46 | | applicable effective date specified in Subsection (c) for the |
---|
47 | 47 | | prohibition may be sold, imported, exported, distributed, |
---|
48 | 48 | | installed, and used after the specified effective date. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), the prohibition |
---|
50 | 50 | | imposed under Subsection (a) takes effect beginning: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) January 1, 2023, for: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (A) propellants; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (B) rigid polyurethane applications and spray |
---|
54 | 54 | | foam, flexible polyurethane, integral skin polyurethane, flexible |
---|
55 | 55 | | polyurethane foam, polystyrene extruded sheet, polyolefin, |
---|
56 | 56 | | phenolic insulation board, and bunstock; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (C) supermarket systems, remote condensing |
---|
58 | 58 | | units, stand-alone units, and vending machines; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (D) refrigerated food processing and dispensing |
---|
60 | 60 | | equipment; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (E) compact residential consumer refrigeration |
---|
62 | 62 | | products; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (F) polystyrene extruded boardstock and billet |
---|
64 | 64 | | and rigid polyurethane low-pressure two-component spray foam; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) January 1, 2024, for residential consumer |
---|
66 | 66 | | refrigeration products other than compact and built-in residential |
---|
67 | 67 | | consumer refrigeration products; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) January 1, 2025, for: |
---|
69 | 69 | | (A) cold storage warehouses; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | (B) built-in residential consumer refrigeration |
---|
71 | 71 | | products; |
---|
72 | 72 | | (4) January 1, 2026, for centrifugal chillers and |
---|
73 | 73 | | positive displacement chillers; and |
---|
74 | 74 | | (5) January 1, 2022, or the effective date of the |
---|
75 | 75 | | restrictions identified in Appendix U or V of 40 C.F.R. Part 82, |
---|
76 | 76 | | Subpart G, as those appendices existed on January 3, 2017, |
---|
77 | 77 | | whichever comes later, for all other applications and end uses for |
---|
78 | 78 | | substitutes not described by the categories listed in Subdivisions |
---|
79 | 79 | | (1) through (4). |
---|
80 | 80 | | (d) The commission by rule may modify the effective date |
---|
81 | 81 | | specified in Subsection (c) for a prohibition if the commission |
---|
82 | 82 | | determines that the modified deadline: |
---|
83 | 83 | | (1) reduces the overall risk to human health or the |
---|
84 | 84 | | environment; and |
---|
85 | 85 | | (2) reflects the earliest date that a substitute is |
---|
86 | 86 | | currently or potentially available. |
---|
87 | 87 | | (e) If the United States Environmental Protection Agency |
---|
88 | 88 | | approves a previously prohibited hydrofluorocarbon blend with a |
---|
89 | 89 | | global warming potential of 750 or less for foam blowing of |
---|
90 | 90 | | polystyrene extruded boardstock and billet and rigid polyurethane |
---|
91 | 91 | | low-pressure two-component spray foam pursuant to the significant |
---|
92 | 92 | | new alternatives policy program under the federal Clean Air Act (42 |
---|
93 | 93 | | U.S.C. Section 7671k), the commission shall expeditiously propose a |
---|
94 | 94 | | rule to conform the requirements established under this section |
---|
95 | 95 | | with that federal action. |
---|
96 | 96 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|