Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB125 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/09/2020

                            87R729 JRR-D
 By: Johnson S.B. No. 125


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of hydrofluorocarbons under the Texas
 Clean Air Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 382, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter L to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER L. REGULATION OF HYDROFLUOROCARBONS
 Sec. 382.551.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Class I substances" and "class II substances"
 mean those substances listed in 42 U.S.C. Section 7671a, as that
 section existed on November 15, 1990, or those substances listed in
 Appendix A or B of 40 C.F.R. Part 82, Subpart A, as those appendices
 existed on January 3, 2017.
 (2)  "Hydrofluorocarbons" means the class of
 greenhouse gases that are saturated organic compounds containing
 hydrogen, fluorine, and carbon.
 (3)  "Residential consumer refrigeration products"
 means a consumer refrigeration product as defined by 10 C.F.R.
 Section 430.2 that is designed or manufactured primarily for
 residential use.
 (4)  "Retrofit" has the meaning assigned by 40 C.F.R.
 Section 82.152, as that section existed as of January 3, 2017.
 (5)  "Substitute" means a chemical, product, or
 alternative manufacturing process, whether existing or retrofit,
 that is used to perform a function previously performed by a class I
 substance or class II substance and any substitute subsequently
 adopted to perform that function, including hydrofluorocarbons.
 Sec. 382.552.  REGULATION OF HYDROFLUOROCARBONS. (a)
 Except as otherwise provided by this section, a person may not offer
 any product or equipment for sale, lease, or rent, or install or
 otherwise cause any product or equipment to enter into commerce in
 this state if that product or equipment consists of, uses, or will
 use a substitute, as provided in Appendix U or V of 40 C.F.R. Part
 82, Subpart G, as those appendices existed on January 3, 2017, for
 the applications or end uses restricted by those appendices.
 (b)  Except where existing equipment is retrofit, Subsection
 (a) does not require a person that acquired a prohibited product or
 equipment before the applicable effective date specified in
 Subsection (c) for the prohibition to cease use of that product or
 equipment. Products or equipment manufactured before the
 applicable effective date specified in Subsection (c) for the
 prohibition may be sold, imported, exported, distributed,
 installed, and used after the specified effective date.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), the prohibition
 imposed under Subsection (a) takes effect beginning:
 (1)  January 1, 2023, for:
 (A)  propellants;
 (B)  rigid polyurethane applications and spray
 foam, flexible polyurethane, integral skin polyurethane, flexible
 polyurethane foam, polystyrene extruded sheet, polyolefin,
 phenolic insulation board, and bunstock;
 (C)  supermarket systems, remote condensing
 units, stand-alone units, and vending machines;
 (D)  refrigerated food processing and dispensing
 equipment;
 (E)  compact residential consumer refrigeration
 products; and
 (F)  polystyrene extruded boardstock and billet
 and rigid polyurethane low-pressure two-component spray foam;
 (2)  January 1, 2024, for residential consumer
 refrigeration products other than compact and built-in residential
 consumer refrigeration products;
 (3)  January 1, 2025, for:
 (A)  cold storage warehouses; and
 (B)  built-in residential consumer refrigeration
 products;
 (4)  January 1, 2026, for centrifugal chillers and
 positive displacement chillers; and
 (5)  January 1, 2022, or the effective date of the
 restrictions identified in Appendix U or V of 40 C.F.R. Part 82,
 Subpart G, as those appendices existed on January 3, 2017,
 whichever comes later, for all other applications and end uses for
 substitutes not described by the categories listed in Subdivisions
 (1) through (4).
 (d)  The commission by rule may modify the effective date
 specified in Subsection (c) for a prohibition if the commission
 determines that the modified deadline:
 (1)  reduces the overall risk to human health or the
 environment; and
 (2)  reflects the earliest date that a substitute is
 currently or potentially available.
 (e)  If the United States Environmental Protection Agency
 approves a previously prohibited hydrofluorocarbon blend with a
 global warming potential of 750 or less for foam blowing of
 polystyrene extruded boardstock and billet and rigid polyurethane
 low-pressure two-component spray foam pursuant to the significant
 new alternatives policy program under the federal Clean Air Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 7671k), the commission shall expeditiously propose a
 rule to conform the requirements established under this section
 with that federal action.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.