Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1251 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 1251
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 6, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1251 By:  Taylor


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain joint graduate degree programs
 between The University of Texas Health Science Center at Houston
 and The University of Texas M. D. Anderson Cancer Center.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 73.102(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  If the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 determines that the role and mission of the institution should be
 changed to include degree-granting authority, the board of regents
 may:
 (1)  prescribe courses and conduct allied health
 professional degree programs related to the purposes of the
 institution described by Subsection (a); and
 (2)  jointly prescribe courses and jointly conduct
 graduate programs at the master's and doctoral levels related to
 those purposes with:
 (A)  The University of Texas Health Science Center
 at Houston Graduate School of Biomedical Sciences; and
 (B)  The University of Texas Health Science Center
 at Houston, with respect to graduate programs separately
 established at the health science center and related to the broad
 fields encompassed in population and public health.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *