Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1251 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021