Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021