Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1296 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            S.B. No. 1296


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the commissioner of insurance to
 review rates and rate changes for certain health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended by adding
 Subtitle N to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE N. RATES
 CHAPTER 1698. RATES FOR CERTAIN COVERAGE
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 1698.001.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
 applies only to rates for the following health benefit plans:
 (1)  an individual major medical expense insurance
 policy to which Chapter 1201 applies;
 (2)  individual health maintenance organization
 coverage; or
 (3)  a small employer health benefit plan provided
 under Chapter 1501.
 Sec. 1698.002.  APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAWS GOVERNING RATES.
 The requirements of this chapter are in addition to any other
 provision of this code governing health benefit plan rates.  Except
 as otherwise provided by this chapter, in the case of a conflict
 between this chapter and another provision of this code, this
 chapter controls.
 SUBCHAPTER B. REVIEW OF RATES
 Sec. 1698.051.  REVIEW OF PREMIUM RATES. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Individual health benefit plan" means:
 (A)  an individual accident and health insurance
 policy to which Chapter 1201 applies; or
 (B)  individual health maintenance organization
 coverage.
 (2)  "Small employer health benefit plan" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 1501.002.
 (b)  The commissioner by rule shall establish a process under
 which the commissioner reviews health benefit plan rates and rate
 changes for compliance with this chapter and other applicable state
 and federal law, including 42 U.S.C. Sections 300gg, 300gg-94, and
 18032(c) and those sections' implementing regulations, including
 rules establishing geographic rating areas.
 Sec. 1698.052.  ADDITIONAL RULES AND GUIDANCE RELATED TO
 INDIVIDUAL HEALTH PLAN RATES. (a) In this section, "qualified
 health plan" has the meaning assigned by Section 1301(a), Patient
 Protection and Affordable Care Act (42 U.S.C. Section 18021).
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt rules and provide guidance
 regarding additional requirements related to individual health
 benefit plans, including qualified health plans, to address the
 following factors:
 (1)  whether the plan issuer has complied with all
 requirements for pooling risk and participating in risk adjustment
 programs in effect under state or federal law;
 (2)  the covered benefits or health benefit plan design
 or, for a rate change, any changes to the benefits or design;
 (3)  the allowable variations for case
 characteristics, risk classifications, and participation in
 programs promoting wellness; and
 (4)  any other factor listed in 45 C.F.R. Section
 154.301(a)(4) to the extent applicable.
 (c)  In making a determination under this section regarding a
 proposed rate for a qualified health plan, the commissioner shall
 consider, in addition to the factors under Subsection (b), the
 following factors:
 (1)  the purchasing power of consumers who are eligible
 for a premium subsidy under the Patient Protection and Affordable
 Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148);
 (2)  if the plan is in the silver level, as described by
 42 U.S.C. Section 18022(d), whether the rate is appropriate for the
 plan in relation to the rates charged for qualified health plans
 offering different levels of coverage, taking into account any
 funding or lack of funding for cost-sharing reductions and the
 covered benefits for each level of coverage; and
 (3)  whether the plan issuer utilized the induced
 demand factors developed by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid
 Services for the risk adjustment program established under 42
 U.S.C. Section 18063 for the level of coverage offered by the plan
 or any state-specific induced demand factors established by
 department regulations.
 (d)  The commissioner may consider the following factors:
 (1)  if the commissioner determines appropriate for
 comparison purposes, medical claims trends reported by plan issuers
 in this state or in a region of this country or the country as a
 whole; and
 (2)  inflation indexes.
 Sec. 1698.053.  PLAN DESIGN FLEXIBILITY WITHIN RATING AREAS.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, a health benefit
 plan issuer may:
 (1)  offer different plan designs by rating area to
 individuals and small employers; and
 (2)  provide network access beyond the geographic
 rating area.
 Sec. 1698.054.  FEDERAL ACTUARIAL LEVELS AND PLAN
 COST-SHARING. Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, a
 health benefit plan issuer may offer plan designs with deductibles,
 coinsurance, and other cost-sharing mechanisms necessary to comply
 with federal actuarial values in the individual and small group
 market in this state.
 Sec. 1698.055.  FEDERAL FUNDING. The commissioner shall
 seek all available federal funding to cover the cost to the
 department of reviewing rates under this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subtitle N, Title 8, Insurance Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to rates for health benefit plan coverage
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
 2023. Rates for health benefit plan coverage delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2023, are governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Department of Insurance is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations that are available
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1296 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1296 passed the House on
 May 26, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 2, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor