Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 21, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021