1 | 1 | | 87R11115 CXP-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1331 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to electric energy storage in the ERCOT power region. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 39.159 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 39.159. ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE IN ERCOT POWER REGION. |
---|
12 | 12 | | Not later than June 1 of each year, the independent organization |
---|
13 | 13 | | certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region shall: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) determine the 24-hour period of peak demand in the |
---|
15 | 15 | | power region from the previous calendar year; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) take measures to encourage the addition of |
---|
17 | 17 | | electric energy storage in the power region as necessary to ensure |
---|
18 | 18 | | that the amount of storage available can provide: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (A) by December 31, 2022, at least 2 percent of |
---|
20 | 20 | | the amount determined under Subdivision (1); |
---|
21 | 21 | | (B) by December 31, 2023, at least 4 percent of |
---|
22 | 22 | | the amount determined under Subdivision (1); |
---|
23 | 23 | | (C) by December 31, 2024, at least 6 percent of |
---|
24 | 24 | | the amount determined under Subdivision (1); |
---|
25 | 25 | | (D) by December 31, 2025, at least 8 percent of |
---|
26 | 26 | | the amount determined under Subdivision (1); and |
---|
27 | 27 | | (E) by December 31, 2026, and December 31 of each |
---|
28 | 28 | | subsequent year, at least 10 percent of the amount determined under |
---|
29 | 29 | | Subdivision (1). |
---|
30 | 30 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|