Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1331 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/10/2021

                            87R11115 CXP-D
 By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1331


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to electric energy storage in the ERCOT power region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.159.  ELECTRIC ENERGY STORAGE IN ERCOT POWER REGION.
 Not later than June 1 of each year, the independent organization
 certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region shall:
 (1)  determine the 24-hour period of peak demand in the
 power region from the previous calendar year; and
 (2)  take measures to encourage the addition of
 electric energy storage in the power region as necessary to ensure
 that the amount of storage available can provide:
 (A)  by December 31, 2022, at least 2 percent of
 the amount determined under Subdivision (1);
 (B)  by December 31, 2023, at least 4 percent of
 the amount determined under Subdivision (1);
 (C)  by December 31, 2024, at least 6 percent of
 the amount determined under Subdivision (1);
 (D)  by December 31, 2025, at least 8 percent of
 the amount determined under Subdivision (1); and
 (E)  by December 31, 2026, and December 31 of each
 subsequent year, at least 10 percent of the amount determined under
 Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.