Senate | 05/22/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |