Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1360 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Hughes, Taylor S.B. No. 1360
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1360 By:  Springer


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of certain criminal conduct by a student or
 employee of a public or private institution of higher education in
 this state; authorizing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.956 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.956.  NOTICE OF CERTAIN CRIMINAL CONDUCT. (a) This
 section applies only to criminal conduct that:
 (1)  is committed or alleged to have been committed by a
 student or employee of a public or private institution of higher
 education in this state; and
 (2)  poses or could have posed a threat to the security
 of the institution, of any political subdivision in which the
 institution is located, or of this state or nation.
 (b)  For purposes of this section, criminal conduct poses or
 could have posed a threat to the security of a public or private
 institution of higher education, of a political subdivision of this
 state, or of this state or nation if the applicable conduct contains
 elements of any of the following:
 (1)  theft of sensitive or protected intellectual
 capital;
 (2)  unauthorized access to sensitive or protected
 information such as intellectual capital, including a breach of
 computer security for purposes of gaining access to that
 information; or
 (3)  espionage conducted on behalf of a foreign
 government.
 (c)  An administrator or department head of a public or
 private institution of higher education who learns of a conviction,
 indictment or other formal criminal charge, or incident of evasion
 or abscondment occurring with respect to criminal conduct to which
 this section applies shall promptly report that information to the
 office of the president of the institution. The president shall
 promptly report that information to the secretary and presiding
 officer of the governing board of the institution.
 (d)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the president
 of a public or private institution of higher education is notified
 or otherwise learns of information described by Subsection (c), the
 president shall provide written notice regarding that information
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing
 committee of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over higher
 education matters. Subject to Subsection (e), the written notice
 must contain any details about the information that are known by the
 president at the time of the notice, including, if known:
 (1)  the degree of access of the specified individual
 to sensitive or protected intellectual capital or to other
 sensitive or protected information;
 (2)  any link or affiliation of the individual to or
 with a foreign government or an organization affiliated with a
 foreign government; and
 (3)  a description of the nature and seriousness of the
 applicable conduct.
 (e)  The information required under Subsection (d) may be
 limited or redacted at the request of an appropriate investigative,
 prosecutorial, or judicial entity if that entity determines that
 the disclosure of that information would impair any pending
 judicial proceeding, including an appellate proceeding.  The name
 of a suspected individual who has not yet been convicted or charged
 must be redacted for purposes of any notice provided under this
 section.
 (f)  The notice is confidential and not subject to disclosure
 under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (g)  A public or private institution of higher education
 whose president fails to timely provide the written notice as
 required by Subsection (d) is liable to the state for a civil
 penalty in an amount not to exceed $20,000 for each violation.  The
 attorney general may investigate any alleged violation of this
 section and may sue to collect the civil penalty described by this
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *