|
06/18/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/18/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Record vote RV#1509
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Amended 1-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Postponed 5/23/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Huberty
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Postponed 5/23/21 3:15 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Postponed 5/21/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported favorably with amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Seliger
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|