Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021