Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021