House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|