Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021