House
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2021
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|