Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021