Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021