Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021