5 | | - | relating to the powers and duties of the Texas Windstorm Insurance |
---|
6 | | - | Association and the windstorm insurance legislative oversight |
---|
7 | | - | board and to certain studies by the board relating to the |
---|
8 | | - | association and the Fair Access to Insurance Requirements Plan. |
---|
| 7 | + | relating to the powers and duties of the windstorm insurance |
---|
| 8 | + | legislative oversight board and to certain studies by the board |
---|
| 9 | + | relating to the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and the Fair |
---|
| 10 | + | Access to Insurance Requirements Plan. |
---|
10 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 2210.351, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
11 | | - | amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (f) to read as |
---|
12 | | - | follows: |
---|
13 | | - | (d) The association may use a rate filed by the association |
---|
14 | | - | without prior commissioner approval if: |
---|
15 | | - | (1) the filing is made not later than the 30th day |
---|
16 | | - | before the date of any use or delivery for use of the rate; |
---|
17 | | - | (2) the filed rate does not exceed [105 percent of] the |
---|
18 | | - | rate in effect on the date on which the filing is made; and |
---|
19 | | - | (3) [the filed rate does not reflect a rate change for |
---|
20 | | - | an individual rating class that is 10 percent higher than the rate |
---|
21 | | - | in effect for that rating class on the date on which the filing is |
---|
22 | | - | made; and |
---|
23 | | - | [(4)] the commissioner has not disapproved the filing |
---|
24 | | - | in writing, advising of the reasons for the disapproval and the |
---|
25 | | - | criteria the association is required to meet to obtain approval. |
---|
26 | | - | (f) The association may not file a rate under this section |
---|
27 | | - | that exceeds the rate in effect on the date on which the filing is |
---|
28 | | - | made unless two-thirds of the board of directors votes to approve |
---|
29 | | - | the rate. |
---|
30 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 2210.352, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
31 | | - | amending Subsection (a-1) and adding Subsection (a-3) to read as |
---|
32 | | - | follows: |
---|
33 | | - | (a-1) The association may use a rate filed by the |
---|
34 | | - | association under this section without prior commissioner approval |
---|
35 | | - | if: |
---|
36 | | - | (1) the filing is made not later than the 30th day |
---|
37 | | - | before the date of any use or delivery for use of the rate; and |
---|
38 | | - | (2) the filed rate does not exceed [105 percent of] the |
---|
39 | | - | rate used by the association in effect on the date on which the |
---|
40 | | - | filing is made[; and |
---|
41 | | - | [(3) the filed rate does not reflect a rate change for |
---|
42 | | - | an individual rating class that is 10 percent higher than the rate |
---|
43 | | - | in effect for that rating class on the date on which the filing is |
---|
44 | | - | made]. |
---|
45 | | - | (a-3) The association may not file a rate under this section |
---|
46 | | - | that exceeds the rate in effect on the date on which the filing is |
---|
47 | | - | made unless two-thirds of the board of directors votes to approve |
---|
48 | | - | the rate. |
---|
49 | | - | SECTION 3. Subchapter N, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is |
---|
| 12 | + | SECTION 1. Subchapter N, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is |
---|
50 | 13 | | amended by adding Section 2210.655 to read as follows: |
---|
51 | 14 | | Sec. 2210.655. TEMPORARY POWERS AND DUTIES OF BOARD; STUDY |
---|
52 | 15 | | OF FUNDING AND FUNDING STRUCTURE. (a) The board shall: |
---|
53 | 16 | | (1) gather information regarding: |
---|
54 | 17 | | (A) how the association's current funding and |
---|
55 | 18 | | funding structure operate; |
---|
56 | 19 | | (B) how the catastrophic risk pools of other |
---|
57 | 20 | | states operate; and |
---|
58 | 21 | | (C) other information that the board considers |
---|
59 | 22 | | necessary to prepare the information required by Subsection (c); |
---|
60 | 23 | | and |
---|
61 | 24 | | (2) hold public meetings to hear testimony from |
---|
62 | 25 | | experts, stakeholders, and other interested parties regarding |
---|
63 | 26 | | recommendations and proposals for establishing and implementing |
---|
64 | 27 | | sustainable funding and a sustainable funding structure for the |
---|
65 | 28 | | association. |
---|
66 | 29 | | (b) The board may request reports and other information as |
---|
67 | 30 | | necessary to implement this section from: |
---|
68 | 31 | | (1) the department; |
---|
69 | 32 | | (2) the association; and |
---|
70 | 33 | | (3) experts, stakeholders, and other interested |
---|
71 | 34 | | parties described by Subsection (a)(2). |
---|
72 | 35 | | (c) The board shall include in the report described by |
---|
73 | 36 | | Section 2210.654 the board's findings regarding the current funding |
---|
74 | 37 | | and funding structure of the association, problems with the funding |
---|
75 | 38 | | and funding structure, and recommendations for legislative action |
---|
76 | 39 | | related to the funding, funding structure, and sustainability of |
---|
77 | 40 | | the association. The report must include: |
---|
78 | 41 | | (1) an analysis of the current funding, funding |
---|
79 | 42 | | structure, and sustainability of the association, including the |
---|
80 | 43 | | association's reliance on debt and reinsurance; and |
---|
81 | 44 | | (2) recommendations for legislative action necessary |
---|
82 | 45 | | to: |
---|
83 | 46 | | (A) address problems with the current funding and |
---|
84 | 47 | | funding structure of the association; and |
---|
85 | 48 | | (B) foster the stability and sustainability of |
---|
86 | 49 | | the association. |
---|
87 | 50 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
89 | 52 | | Acts of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, are amended to |
---|
90 | 53 | | read as follows: |
---|
91 | 54 | | (c) Not later than January 1, 2023 [2021], the windstorm |
---|
92 | 55 | | insurance legislative oversight board shall submit to the governor, |
---|
93 | 56 | | the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
94 | 57 | | representatives, and the Texas Department of Insurance a written |
---|
95 | 58 | | report of a [the] study conducted under this section. The report |
---|
96 | 59 | | must include the findings and legislative recommendations of the |
---|
97 | 60 | | board. |
---|
98 | 61 | | (d) This section expires January 1, 2024 [2022]. |
---|
99 | | - | SECTION 5. Sections 2210.351 and 2210.352, Insurance Code, |
---|
100 | | - | as amended by this Act, apply only to a rate filed by the Texas |
---|
101 | | - | Windstorm Insurance Association with the Texas Department of |
---|
102 | | - | Insurance on or after the effective date of this Act. A rate filed |
---|
103 | | - | with the Texas Department of Insurance before the effective date of |
---|
104 | | - | this Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before |
---|
105 | | - | that date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
106 | | - | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
107 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
108 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
109 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1448 passed the Senate on |
---|
110 | | - | April 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
111 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2021, by the |
---|
112 | | - | following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 5. |
---|
113 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
114 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
115 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1448 passed the House, with |
---|
116 | | - | amendment, on April 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 138, |
---|
117 | | - | Nays 3, two present not voting. |
---|
118 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
119 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
120 | | - | Approved: |
---|
121 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
122 | | - | Date |
---|
123 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
124 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 62 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|