Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021