Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1489 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/13/2021

                            By: Hall S.B. No. 1489
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2021; March 24, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 13, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; May 13, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1489 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of information regarding COVID-19
 prevention and treatment to individuals receiving a COVID-19 viral
 test.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 81, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter K to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER K. COVID-19 TESTING, PREVENTION, AND TREATMENT
 Sec. 81.451.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "COVID-19" means the 2019 novel coronavirus
 disease.
 (2)  "Health care provider" means a person who is
 licensed, certified, or otherwise authorized to provide COVID-19
 viral testing.
 Sec. 81.452.  COVID-19 PREVENTION AND TREATMENT
 INFORMATION.  The department shall post on the department's
 Internet website a printable brochure containing information about
 preventative measures and treatments for COVID-19.  The brochure
 must include the following information:
 (1)  methods for improving the functioning of an
 individual's immune system;
 (2)  the importance of therapeutic prevention of
 COVID-19, including the use of nutraceuticals, the use of
 prescription medications, and the benefits and risks associated
 with receiving a vaccination;
 (3)  the importance of seeking treatment for COVID-19
 as soon as symptoms appear and a list of methods for treating
 COVID-19 that may be effective, including available medications;
 and
 (4)  advanced home treatments for reducing COVID-19
 symptoms and preventing hospitalization after an individual
 contracts COVID-19, including monoclonal antibody therapy.
 Sec. 81.453.  REQUIREMENTS FOR HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS. A
 health care provider that performs a COVID-19 viral test on an
 individual shall, at the time the provider performs the test,
 provide a printed or electronic copy of the brochure described by
 Section 81.452 to the individual receiving the test.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Department of State Health Services shall develop
 and post on the department's Internet website the brochure required
 by Section 81.452, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *