Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 16, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021