Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1490 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 1490


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board to authorize certain degree programs offered by
 private postsecondary educational institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.303, Education Code, as amended by
 S.B. 1781, Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.303.  EXEMPTIONS. (a)  Unless specifically provided
 otherwise, the provisions of this subchapter do not apply to an
 institution that is fully accredited by, and is not operating under
 sanctions imposed by, a recognized accrediting agency, or an
 institution or degree program that has received approval by a state
 agency authorizing the institution's graduates to take a
 professional or vocational state licensing examination
 administered by that agency.  The granting of permission by a state
 agency to a graduate of an institution to take a licensing
 examination does not by itself constitute approval of the
 institution or degree program required for an exemption under this
 subsection.
 (b)  The exemptions provided by Subsection (a) apply only to
 the degree level for which an institution is accredited, and if an
 institution offers to award a degree at a level for which it is not
 accredited, the exemption does not apply.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), the [The] board
 may approve the issuance of a certificate of authorization to grant
 degrees [issue] to an exempt institution or person [a certificate
 of authorization to grant degrees]. The board may adopt rules
 regarding a process to allow an exempt institution or person to
 apply [for] and receive approval for a certificate of authorization
 under this section.
 (c-1)  The board may not approve the issuance of a
 certificate of authorization for an exempt institution to grant a
 professional degree or to represent that credits earned in this
 state are applicable toward a professional degree except to the
 extent allowed for an authorized institution operating under a
 State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement (SARA). In this
 subsection, "professional degree" includes Doctor of Medicine
 (M.D.), Doctor of Osteopathy (D.O.), Doctor of Dental Surgery
 (D.D.S.), Doctor of Veterinary Medicine (D.V.M.), Juris Doctor
 (J.D.), and Bachelor of Laws (LL.B.).
 (d)  The board by rule may require an exempt institution or
 person to ensure that the financial resources and financial
 stability of the institution or person are adequate to provide
 education of a good quality and to fulfill the institution's or
 person's commitments to its enrolled students and may require the
 institution or person to provide to the board documentation of the
 institution's or person's compliance with those requirements.
 Rules adopted under this subsection must:
 (1)  require the institution or person to maintain
 reserves, lines of credit, or surety instruments that, when
 combined with tuition and fee receipts, are sufficient to allow the
 institution or person to fulfill its educational obligations to its
 enrolled students if the institution or person is unable to
 continue to provide instruction to its enrolled students for any
 reason; and
 (2)  require that the financial resources maintained
 under Subdivision (1) be conditioned to allow only the board to
 withdraw funds for the benefit of the institution's or person's
 enrolled students under the circumstance described by Subdivision
 (1).
 (e)  To enable the board to verify the conditions under which
 a certificate of authorization issued under this section is held,
 the board by rule may require an exempt institution or person to
 report to the board on a continuing basis other appropriate
 information in addition to the documentation required under
 Subsection (d).
 (f)  An exempt institution or person continues in that status
 only if the institution or person maintains accreditation by, and
 is not operating under sanctions imposed by, a recognized
 accrediting agency or otherwise meets the provisions of Subsection
 (a).
 (g)  The board by rule shall provide for due process and
 shall provide procedures for revoking or placing conditions on the
 exemption status of an institution or person or for revoking or
 placing conditions on a previously issued certificate of
 authorization.
 (h)  Under the rules described by Subsection (g), the board
 may revoke or place conditions on an institution's or person's
 exemption status or certificate of authorization only if the board
 has reasonable cause to believe that the institution or person has
 violated this subchapter or any rule adopted under this subchapter.
 (i)  Before revoking or placing conditions on an
 institution's or person's exemption status or certificate of
 authorization under Subsection (h), the board must provide to the
 institution or person written notice of the board's impending
 action and include the grounds for that action.
 (j)  If the board places conditions on an institution's or
 person's exemption status or certificate of authorization under
 Subsection (h), until the board removes the conditions, the board
 may reexamine the applicable institution or person at least twice
 annually following the date the board provided notice under
 Subsection (i).
 (k)  A private postsecondary educational institution may not
 establish or operate a branch campus, extension center, or other
 off-campus unit in Texas except as provided by this subsection or
 the rules of the board.  This subsection does not apply to a private
 or independent institution of higher education as defined by
 Section 61.003.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.306, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and
 (d) to read as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Subsections (c) and (c-1), the [The] board
 may issue a certificate of authority to grant a degree or degrees
 and to enroll students for courses which may be applicable toward a
 degree if it finds that the applicant meets the standards
 established by the board for certification.
 (c)  The board may not issue a certificate of authority for a
 private postsecondary educational institution to grant a
 professional degree or to represent that credits earned in this
 state are applicable toward a professional degree if the
 institution is chartered in a foreign country or has its principal
 office or primary educational program in a foreign country.
 (c-1)  The board may issue a certificate of authority for a
 private postsecondary educational institution to grant a
 professional degree or to represent that credits earned in this
 state are applicable toward a professional degree only if the board
 determines that:
 (1)  the capacity and ability of similar professional
 degree programs at institutions of higher education and private or
 independent institutions of higher education are insufficient to
 meet the state's current market needs;
 (2)  the institution seeking the certificate of
 authority:
 (A)  has the necessary faculty and other resources
 to ensure student success; and
 (B)  is subject to and agrees to meet the same
 standards for approval and all academic criteria applicable to
 similar professional degree programs offered by institutions of
 higher education and private or independent institutions of higher
 education; and
 (3)  sufficient placements are available to students
 for required field-based experience, such as clinicals or
 clerkships, for the proposed professional degree.
 (d)  In this section:
 (1)  "Institution of higher education" and "private or
 independent institution of higher education" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (2)  "Professional [subsection, "professional] degree"
 includes a Doctor of Medicine (M.D.), Doctor of Osteopathy (D.O.),
 Doctor of Dental Surgery (D.D.S.), Doctor of Veterinary Medicine
 (D.V.M.), Juris Doctor (J.D.), and Bachelor of Laws (LL.B.).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1490 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1490 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120,
 Nays 17, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor