House
|
05/07/2021
|
Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Postponed 5/6/21 11:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3827
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Amended FA1 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|