Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021