Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 7, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021