4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to the exclusion of certain payment processing services |
---|
6 | 10 | | from the definition of "data processing service" for purposes of |
---|
7 | 11 | | sales and use taxes. |
---|
8 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 151.0035, Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
10 | 14 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 15 | | Sec. 151.0035. "DATA PROCESSING SERVICE". (a) "Data |
---|
12 | 16 | | processing service" includes: |
---|
13 | 17 | | (1) word processing, data entry, data retrieval, data |
---|
14 | 18 | | search, information compilation, payroll and business accounting |
---|
15 | 19 | | data production, and other computerized data and information |
---|
16 | 20 | | storage or manipulation; |
---|
17 | 21 | | (2) the performance of a totalisator service with the |
---|
18 | 22 | | use of computational equipment required by Subtitle A-1, Title 13, |
---|
19 | 23 | | Occupations Code (Texas Racing Act); and |
---|
20 | 24 | | (3) [, and other computerized data and information |
---|
21 | 25 | | storage or manipulation. "Data processing service" also includes] |
---|
22 | 26 | | the use of a computer or computer time for data processing whether |
---|
23 | 27 | | the processing is performed by the provider of the computer or |
---|
24 | 28 | | computer time or by the purchaser or other beneficiary of the |
---|
25 | 29 | | service. |
---|
26 | 30 | | (b) "Data processing service" does not include: |
---|
27 | 31 | | (1) the transcription of medical dictation by a |
---|
28 | 32 | | medical transcriptionist; |
---|
29 | 33 | | (2) services exclusively to encrypt electronic |
---|
30 | 34 | | payment information for acceptance onto a payment card network |
---|
31 | 35 | | described by Subdivision (3)(E) to comply with standards set by the |
---|
32 | 36 | | Payment Card Industry Security Standards Council; or |
---|
33 | 37 | | (3) settling of an electronic payment transaction by: |
---|
34 | 38 | | (A) a downstream payment processor or point of |
---|
35 | 39 | | sale payment processor that routes electronic payment information |
---|
36 | 40 | | to an entity described by Paragraph (C) or (E); |
---|
37 | 41 | | (B) a person who is engaged in the business of |
---|
38 | 42 | | money transmission and required to obtain a license under Section |
---|
39 | 43 | | 151.302(a), Finance Code; |
---|
40 | 44 | | (C) a federally insured financial institution, |
---|
41 | 45 | | as defined by Section 201.101, Finance Code, that is organized |
---|
42 | 46 | | under the laws of this state, another state, or the United States, |
---|
43 | 47 | | or an affiliate of the institution; |
---|
44 | 48 | | (D) a person who has entered into a sponsorship |
---|
45 | 49 | | agreement with an entity described by Paragraph (C) for the purpose |
---|
46 | 50 | | of settling that entity's electronic payment transactions through a |
---|
47 | 51 | | payment card network; or |
---|
48 | 52 | | (E) a payment card network that allows a person |
---|
49 | 53 | | to accept a specific brand of debit or credit card by routing |
---|
50 | 54 | | information and data to settle an electronic payment transaction. |
---|
51 | 55 | | (c) For purposes of Subsection (b)(3): |
---|
52 | 56 | | (1) "Downstream payment processor" means a person |
---|
53 | 57 | | described by 7 T.A.C. Section 33.4(c), as that provision existed on |
---|
54 | 58 | | January 1, 2021. |
---|
55 | 59 | | (2) "Point of sale payment processor" means a person |
---|
56 | 60 | | described by 7 T.A.C. Section 33.4(d), as that provision existed on |
---|
57 | 61 | | January 1, 2021. |
---|
58 | 62 | | (3) "Settling of an electronic payment transaction" |
---|
59 | 63 | | means the authorization, clearing, or funding of a payment made by |
---|
60 | 64 | | credit card, debit card, gift card, stored value card, electronic |
---|
61 | 65 | | check, virtual currency, loyalty program currency such as points or |
---|
62 | 66 | | miles, or a similar method. The term does not include charges by a |
---|
63 | 67 | | marketplace provider, as that term is defined by Section 151.0242. |
---|
64 | 68 | | (d) "Data storage," as used in this section, does not |
---|
65 | 69 | | include a classified advertisement, banner advertisement, vertical |
---|
66 | 70 | | advertisement, or link when the item is displayed on an Internet |
---|
67 | 71 | | website owned by another person. |
---|
68 | 72 | | SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act do not affect |
---|
69 | 73 | | tax liability accruing before the effective date of this Act. That |
---|
70 | 74 | | liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been enacted, |
---|
71 | 75 | | and the former law is continued in effect for the collection of |
---|
72 | 76 | | taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability |
---|
73 | 77 | | for those taxes. |
---|
74 | 78 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect October 1, 2021. |
---|
75 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
76 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
77 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 153 passed the Senate on |
---|
78 | | - | April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
79 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the |
---|
80 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
81 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
82 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
83 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 153 passed the House, with |
---|
84 | | - | amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
85 | | - | Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
86 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
87 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
88 | | - | Approved: |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | Date |
---|
91 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
92 | | - | Governor |
---|