Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1531 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1531
1+By: West S.B. No. 1531
2+ (Turner of Tarrant)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to formula funding for excess undergraduate credit hours
68 at public institutions of higher education and to the tuition rate
79 that may be charged for those credit hours.
810 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
911 SECTION 1. Section 54.014, Education Code, is amended by
1012 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
1113 read as follows:
1214 (a) An institution of higher education may charge a resident
1315 undergraduate student tuition at a higher rate than the rate
1416 charged to other resident undergraduate students, not to exceed the
1517 rate charged to nonresident undergraduate students, if before the
1618 semester or other academic session begins the student has
1719 previously attempted a number of semester credit hours for courses
1820 taken at any institution of higher education while classified as a
1921 resident student for tuition purposes that exceeds [by at least 30
2022 hours] the number of semester credit hours required for completion
2123 of the degree program in which the student is enrolled by at least:
2224 (1) for an associate degree program, 15 hours; or
2325 (2) for a baccalaureate degree program, 30 hours.
2426 (a-1) For purposes of Subsection (a) [this subsection], an
2527 undergraduate student who is not enrolled in a degree program is
2628 considered to be enrolled in a baccalaureate degree program [or
2729 programs requiring a minimum of 120 semester credit hours,
2830 including minors and double majors, and for completion of any
2931 certificate or other special program in which the student is also
3032 enrolled, including a program with a study-abroad component].
3133 (a-2) An institution of higher education that charges
3234 students tuition at a higher rate under Subsection (a) [this
3335 subsection] may adopt a policy under which the institution exempts
3436 from the payment of that higher rate a student that is subject to
3537 the payment of the higher rate solely as a result of hardship as
3638 determined by the institution under the policy.
3739 SECTION 2. Sections 61.0595(a) and (b), Education Code, are
3840 amended to read as follows:
3941 (a) In the formulas established under Section 61.059, the
4042 board may not include funding for semester credit hours earned by a
4143 resident undergraduate student who before the semester or other
4244 academic session begins has previously attempted a number of
4345 semester credit hours for courses taken at any institution of
4446 higher education while classified as a resident student for tuition
4547 purposes that exceeds [by at least 30 hours] the number of semester
4648 credit hours required for completion of the degree program or
4749 programs in which the student is enrolled, including minors and
4850 double majors, and for completion of any certificate or other
4951 special program in which the student is also enrolled, including a
5052 program with a study-abroad component, by at least:
5153 (1) for an associate degree program, 15 hours; or
5254 (2) for a baccalaureate degree program, 30 hours.
5355 (b) For purposes of Subsection (a), an undergraduate
5456 student who is not enrolled in a degree program is considered to be
5557 enrolled in a baccalaureate degree program [requiring a minimum of
5658 120 semester credit hours].
57- SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act to Section
58- 54.014, Education Code, applies beginning with tuition charged to
59- students enrolling for the first time in an associate degree
60- program at a public institution of higher education for the 2023
61- fall semester. Tuition charged to a student who first enrolled in
62- an associate degree program at a public institution of higher
63- education before the 2023 fall semester is governed by the law in
64- effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
65- former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
66- SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act to Section
67- 61.0595, Education Code, applies beginning with funding
68- recommendations made under Section 61.059, Education Code, for the
69- state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2023, for semester
70- credit hours earned by students initially enrolling in an associate
71- degree program at a public institution of higher education for the
72- 2023 fall semester or a subsequent semester or term. Funding
73- recommendations for semester credit hours earned by a student who
74- initially enrolled in an associate degree program at a public
75- institution of higher education before the 2023 fall semester are
76- governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date
77- of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that
78- purpose.
59+ SECTION 3. Section 54.014, Education Code, as amended by
60+ this Act, applies beginning with tuition charged for the 2023 fall
61+ semester.
62+ SECTION 4. Section 61.0595, Education Code, as amended by
63+ this Act, applies beginning with funding recommendations made under
64+ Section 61.059, Education Code, for the state fiscal biennium
65+ beginning September 1, 2023.
7966 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
80- ______________________________ ______________________________
81- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
82- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1531 passed the Senate on
83- April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
84- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
85- following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
86- ______________________________
87- Secretary of the Senate
88- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1531 passed the House, with
89- amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 73,
90- Nays 72, one present not voting.
91- ______________________________
92- Chief Clerk of the House
93- Approved:
94- ______________________________
95- Date
96- ______________________________
97- Governor